Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {663222/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Finance |