Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Referred Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Substitute Committee Amendment {243621/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion Withdraw Committee Amendment {873027/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1 Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {873027/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {873027/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|