Senate
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Floor Amendment {353522/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (46-85)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {913029/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|