Senate
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (105-31)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {673126/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {433422/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
|
|
|