Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Third Reading Passed (126-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {433526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Finance |