LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Maryland MD
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB84
Action History
MD
Maryland Senate Bill SB84
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Maryland 2022 Regular Session
Maryland Senate Bill SB84
Action History
Senate
02/15/2022
Hearing canceled
Senate
02/03/2022
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate
01/26/2022
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Senate
01/12/2022
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate
01/05/2022
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate
10/14/2021
Pre-filed