Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {463426/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |