Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {763625/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 10/28/2021 | Pre-filed |