Senate
|
05/29/2022
|
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (33-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (111-22)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {803123/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Rereferred to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Floor Amendment {413521/1 (Senator West) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator West) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Committee Amendment Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {733424/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation
|
|
|