Senate | 04/09/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Passed (125-9) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {803227/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {953025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |