House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (31-15) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {343422/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {343422/1 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |