Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {753025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |