Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (123-15) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {803428/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |