House
|
04/07/2022
|
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {503424/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (16-29)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {133228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {493629/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (17-27)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {593122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-28)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-27)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {683728/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (16-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {463720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {513425/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (19-27)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {933725/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-28)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Floor Amendment {683421/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-31)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-16)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Gallion) Rejected (16-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Committee Amendment Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {543627/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|