House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Judiciary | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Third Reading Passed (25-21) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {123822/1 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |