Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (130-4) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {923628/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {153026/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/17/2022 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 10/15/2021 | Pre-filed |