Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Floor Amendment {853620/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {253228/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |