Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (129-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Floor Committee Amendment {643225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {503529/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |