House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {713027/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |