Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (119-17) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-14) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {103426/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 08/26/2021 | Pre-filed |