Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB913 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/30/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MATTER ADDED TO EXIS TING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0913*  
  
SENATE BILL 913 
B1   	2lr3074 
    	CF HB 602 
By: Senator Bailey 
Introduced and read first time: February 11, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Budget and Taxation, February 25, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 18, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Board of Public Works – Sotterley Plantation Historic Sotterley – Operating 2 
Grant 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Governor, for certain fiscal years, to include a certain 4 
amount in the annual budget bill for the Board of Public Works to provide an 5 
operating grant to be used for certain purposes related to Sotterley Plantation 6 
Historic Sotterley; and generally relating to operating grants for Sotterley Plantation 7 
Historic Sotterley. 8 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9 
That: 10 
 
 (a) Subject to subsections (b) and (c) of this section, for fiscal years 2024, 2025, 11 
and 2026, the Governor shall include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $500,000 12 
for the Board of Public Works to provide an operating grant to the Board of Trustees of the 13 
Historic Sotterley, Inc., for the design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and 14 
general operations and expenses of Sotterley Plantation Historic Sotterley, located in 15 
Hollywood, in the following amounts for the following years: 16 
 
 (1) $350,000 for fiscal year 2024; 17 
 
 (2) $375,000 for fiscal year 2025; and 18 
 
 (3) $400,000 for fiscal year 2026. 19  2 	SENATE BILL 913  
 
 
 
 (b) The money included in an appropriation required under subsection (a) of this 1 
section shall be expended by the Board of Public Works as a grant to the grantee. 2 
 
 (c) (1) All money included in an appropriation required under subsection (a) 3 
of this section must be expended for the purposes provided by June 30, 2026.  4 
 
 (2) If money included in an appropriation required under subsection (a) of 5 
this section remains in the custody of the Board of Public Works on June 30, 2026, the 6 
Board shall transfer the money to the Board of Trustees of the Historic Sotterley, Inc., and 7 
report the status of the money to the General Assembly in accordance with § 2–1257 of the 8 
State Government Article. 9 
 
 (d) On or before June 30 each year, the Board of Public Works shall, in accordance 10 
with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, report to the General Assembly on the grant 11 
required under subsection (a) of this section. 12 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 13 
1, 2022. It shall remain effective for a period of 4 years and 1 month and, at the end of June 14 
30, 2026, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be 15 
abrogated and of no further force and effect. 16 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.