House | 04/08/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {363927/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |