Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/18/2022 | Referred Environment and Transportation Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {953722/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Pre-filed |