Senate | 05/27/2022 | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (36-11) | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (94-36) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {843520/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (32-15) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {443920/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |