Senate | 05/12/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Third Reading Passed (128-8) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |