House | 04/08/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593925/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/13/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |