Maryland 2022 2022 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB945 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/07/2022

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0945*  
  
SENATE BILL 945 
M3   	2lr3189 
    	CF HB 869 
By: Senator Gallion Senators Gallion, Ellis, Hester, Lam, Patterson, Reilly, 
Simonaire, and Washington 
Introduced and read first time: February 13, 2022 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs, February 25, 2022 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 26, 2022 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Wetlands and Waterways Program Division – Authorizations Permitting for 2 
Ecological Restoration Projects – Required Study 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of the Environment Environment’s Wetlands 4 
and Waterways Program Division to establish a certain process for reviewing and 5 
evaluating applications for wetlands and waterways authorizations study permitting 6 
for ecological restoration projects on or before a certain date; and generally relating 7 
to wetlands and waterways authorizations a study on permitting for ecological 8 
restoration projects. 9 
 
BY adding to 10 
 Article – Environment 11 
Section 5–203.2 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2013 Replacement Volume and 2021 Supplement) 14 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 15 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 16 
 
 (a) The Department of the Environment’s Wetlands and Waterways Program 17 
Division shall conduct a comprehensive study, analysis, and evaluation of: 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 945  
 
 
 (1) State statutes and regulations that affect permitting or completion of 1 
ecological restoration projects permitted by the Wetlands and Waterways Program 2 
Division; 3 
 
 (2) the permit and permit review process for ecological restoration permits 4 
in the State; 5 
 
 (3) the opportunities for robust public comment and community review of 6 
ecological restoration projects in order to: 7 
 
 (i) determine if the short–term and long–term effects of a project 8 
will meet the aims of the community; and 9 
 
 (ii) review the scientific basis of the purpose of a project and its 10 
connection to the watershed; 11 
 
 (4) the average time it takes between project submittal to project approval 12 
for an ecological restoration project in the State compared to other states; and 13 
 
 (5) the efficiency and effectiveness of the current joint application permit 14 
and permit review processes and current counterincentives to watershed–based stream 15 
restoration. 16 
 
 (b) The Wetlands and Waterways Program Division shall conduct the 17 
comprehensive study, analysis, and evaluation required under subsection (a) of this section 18 
in consultation and coordination with: 19 
 
 (1) the Department of Natural Resources; 20 
 
 (2) representatives of: 21 
 
 (i) the ecological restoration industry that have completed ecological 22 
restoration projects in the State; 23 
 
 (ii) environmental advocacy organizations with scientific or practical 24 
background in ecosystem restoration; 25 
 
 (iii) community groups and community –based environmental 26 
advocacy organizations; and 27 
 
 (iv) county governments in the State, including county 28 
environmental policy directors and county sustainability officers; and 29 
 
 (3) if able to participate, representatives from: 30 
 
 (i) the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science – 31 
Chesapeake Biological Laboratory; 32   	SENATE BILL 945 	3 
 
 
 
 (ii) the University of Maryland Palmer Lab; and 1 
 
 (iii) any other scientific research center or laboratory that specializes 2 
in ecosystem restoration.  3 
 
 (c) The Wetlands and Waterways Program Division shall develop legislative and 4 
regulatory recommendations based on the results of the comprehensive study, analysis, 5 
and evaluation required under subsection (a) of this section, including: 6 
 
 (1) the definition of ecological restoration that incorporates measurable 7 
scientific aims, including: 8 
 
 (i) the reduction of nitrogen, sediment, and phosphorus pollution; 9 
and 10 
 
 (ii) the improvement of benthic environment as compared with 11 
conditions existing at the site of the project during site selection; 12 
 
 (2) recommendations for a separate and distinct permit application and 13 
processes for watershed–based ecological restoration permits; 14 
 
 (3) a schedule for regular evaluation of regulations to determine if changes 15 
are necessary to reflect scientific advances in the field, in accordance with § 10–132 of the 16 
State Government Article; 17 
 
 (4) an evaluation of the need for continuing education requirements for 18 
staff of the Department of the Environment and the Department of Natural Resources 19 
involved in permitting activities for wetlands and waterways;  20 
 
 (5) recommendations for ensuring permits are issued in a timely and 21 
efficient manner, and any other improvements to the existing permit process; 22 
 
 (6) recommendations for permits to be reviewed holistically and in a 23 
manner that weighs the benefits of a restored ecosystem over individual resources; 24 
 
 (7) to ensure that permits are issued in a timely and efficient manner to 25 
achieve the optimal ecosystem restoration outcome, changes to statutes and regulations 26 
that hinder or conflict with ecological restoration permits, review processes, or project 27 
implementation; and 28 
 
 (8) an analysis of whether additional staff or resources are needed for the 29 
establishment of a new permit.  30 
 
 (d) On or before June 1, 2024, the Department of the Environment shall report 31 
on the findings and recommendations in accordance with this section to the Governor and, 32 
in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly.  33  4 	SENATE BILL 945  
 
 
 
Article – Environment 1 
 
5–203.2. 2 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ESTA BLISH 3 
A PROCESS FOR REVIEWING AND EVALUA TING APPLICATIONS FO R WETLANDS AND 4 
WATERWAYS AUTHORIZAT IONS FOR ECOLOGICAL RESTORATION PROJECTS . 5 
 
 (B) THE PROCESS REQUIRED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION , 6 
SHALL: 7 
 
 (1) BE SEPARATE AND DISTI NCT FROM THE PROCESS FOR REVIEWING 8 
AND EVALUATING APPLICATI ONS FOR WETLANDS AND WATERWAYS 9 
AUTHORIZATIONS FOR D EVELOPMENT PROJECTS ;  10 
 
 (2) (I) BE BASED ON THE BEST AVAILABLE SCIENCE ; AND 11 
 
 (II) BE UPDATED ACCORDINGL Y AS THE BEST AVAILA BLE 12 
SCIENCE EVOLVES ;  13 
 
 (3) REQUIRE APPLICATIONS TO BE REVIEWED BY INDIVIDUAL S WITH 14 
EXPERTISE IN ECOLOGI CAL RESTORATION PROJ ECTS, INCLUDING TRAINING O N: 15 
 
 (I) THE BEST AVAILABLE SC IENCE, TECHNOLOGY , AND 16 
PRACTICES APPLICABLE TO ECOLOGICAL RESTOR ATION PROJECTS ; AND 17 
 
 (II) THE DIFFERENCES BETWE EN DEVELOPMENT PR OJECTS 18 
AND ECOLOGICAL RESTO RATION PROJECTS ;  19 
 
 (4) ESTABLISH REVIEW CRIT ERIA THAT ARE SPECIF ICALLY 20 
TAILORED TO RESTORAT ION;  21 
 
 (5) REQUIRE APPLICATIONS TO BE REVIEWED IN A MANNER THAT 22 
WEIGHS THE BENEFITS OF A RESTORED ECOSYS TEM OVER THE BENEFIT S OF AN 23 
INDIVIDUAL WETLAND O R WATERWAY ;  24 
 
 (6) IF APPROPRIATE , WAIVE ANY REQUIREMEN T TO MINIMIZE 25 
ALTERATION, IMPAIRMENT , OR DISTURBANCE OF A WETLAND OR WATERWAY IF AN 26 
ALTERATION, IMPAIRMENT , OR DISTURBANCE OF TH E WETLAND OR WATERWA Y IS 27 
NECESSARY FOR THE VI ABILITY OF THE PROJECT ; AND 28 
   	SENATE BILL 945 	5 
 
 
 (7) PROVIDE A METHOD FOR EXPEDITING REVIEW OF WETLANDS AND 1 
WATERWAYS AUTHORIZAT IONS FOR ECOLOGICAL RESTORATION PROJECTS FOR THE 2 
PURPOSES OF: 3 
 
 (I) ENSURING STATE FUNDING FOR RES TORATION IS USED 4 
MOST EFFICIENTLY AND EFFECTIVELY; AND 5 
 
 (II) AVOIDING UNNECESSARY COSTS ASSOCIATED WIT H 6 
WETLANDS AND WATERWA YS AUTHORIZATIONS AN D PROJECT CONSTRUCTI ON IN 7 
ORDER TO LOWER THE O VERALL COSTS TO THE STATE TO ACHIEVE ITS 8 
CHESAPEAKE BAY RESTORATION GOALS UNDER THE CHESAPEAKE BAY TOTAL 9 
MAXIMUM DAILY LOAD AND THE 2014 CHESAPEAKE BAY WATERSHED 10 
AGREEMENT. 11 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 12 
October 1, 2022. 13 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.