Senate | 05/29/2022 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 557 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (104-29) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {583623/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/13/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |