Senate | 05/16/2022 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (122-5) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m. | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {893626/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |