House | 04/08/2022 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m. | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {553528/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |