House | 03/29/2022 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Withdrawn | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {393328/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |