Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2022
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Rereferred to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2022
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Floor Amendment {653321/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments {943926/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
First Reading Senate Rules
|
|
|