House | 04/08/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {953428/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |