House | 04/11/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {933122/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/09/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {593627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |