House | 04/08/2022 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments {273028/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/19/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |