House | 04/08/2022 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m. | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Rereferred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Hearing 3/16 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |