Senate | 05/12/2022 | Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 7 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2022 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Floor Amendment {173329/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Zucker) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Favorable Report by Senate Rules | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | First Reading Senate Rules |