Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-13) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Floor Amendment {733520/1 (Senator West) Rejected (16-30) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {233825/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (101-33) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {223429/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |