Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (100-37) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Floor Amendment {823428/1 (Delegate Charkoudian) Adopted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Floor Amendment {123025/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-99) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Floor Amendment {903028/1 (Delegate Qi) Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {503126/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |