House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {933829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |