House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (102-37) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (32-11) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {323427/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (100-35) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {973322/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |