House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |