EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. Underlining indicates amendments to bill. Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by amendment. *hb1155* HOUSE BILL 1155 J1 3lr2409 By: Delegate Bridges Delegates Bridges, Pena–Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Rosenberg, Taveras, White, and Woods Introduced and read first time: February 10, 2023 Assigned to: Health and Government Operations Committee Report: Favorable with amendments House action: Adopted Read second time: March 21, 2023 CHAPTER ______ AN ACT concerning 1 Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned Integrated Behavioral Health 2 Model 3 FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned 4 Integrated Behavior Health Model to study youth codesigned behavioral health 5 models and develop a plan and make recommendations regarding the 6 implementation of a youth codesigned behavioral health care pilot in the State; and 7 generally relating to the Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned Integrated 8 Behavioral Health Model. 9 Preamble 10 WHEREAS, Experience based codesign is an evidence–based process that involves 11 people in the decisions that will have an impact on them, and where decision–making power 12 is shared between professionals and people who use services; and 13 WHEREAS, The youth codesign model is a model in which youth are not only the 14 recipients of services, but are partners in all elements of that service, including 15 implementation, evaluation, and the evolution of services; and 16 WHEREAS, Integrated youth behavioral health care is an enhanced primary care 17 model, typically with a single, visible, trusted location, including providers organized as a 18 2 HOUSE BILL 1155 dedicated team of clinical and nonclinical personnel, such as a peer worker, providing the 1 full spectrum of care for a youth and their family; now, therefore, 2 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 3 That: 4 (a) There is a Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned Integrated 5 Behavioral Health Model. 6 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 7 (1) the Secretary of the Department of Juvenile Services, or the Secretary’s 8 designee; 9 (2) the Deputy Secretary for Behavioral Health, or the Deputy Secretary’s 10 designee; 11 (3) the Executive Director of the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, 12 Youth, and Victim Services, or the Executive Director’s designee; 13 (4) five individuals who are at least 16 years old and under the age of 25 14 years who have experienced behavioral health conditions and, to the extent practicable, are 15 from diverse geographic areas of the State, appointed by the Secretary of Health; and 16 (5) the following members to be selected through application to the 17 Behavioral Health Administration: 18 (i) two representatives of behavioral health advocacy organizations 19 representing consumers and families; 20 (ii) one representative of a community behavioral health provider 21 serving children and youth; 22 (iii) one representative of a peer–led behavioral health organization; 23 and 24 (iv) one representative of an organization serving children and youth 25 involved in the juvenile justice system. 26 (c) The Deputy Secretary for Behavioral Health, or the Deputy Secretary’s 27 designee, shall serve as the chair of the Workgroup. 28 (d) The Behavioral Health Administration shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 29 (e) A member of the Workgroup is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under 30 the Standard State Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 31 HOUSE BILL 1155 3 (f) The Workgroup shall: 1 (1) review youth codesigned integrated behavioral health models across 2 the country and internationally; 3 (2) identify successful youth codesigned integrated behavioral health 4 models, and the tools, strategies, and funding sources needed to implement similar 5 strategies in the State; 6 (3) develop a plan for establishing a sustainable youth advisory committee 7 to play an ongoing role in the development and implementation of the pilot program 8 described in item (4) of this subsection; and 9 (4) develop a plan for implementing a youth codesigned integrated 10 behavioral health care pilot program in the State that: 11 (i) includes a program plan for three sites in different geographic 12 areas in the State; 13 (ii) uses the codesign model in collaboration with the youth advisory 14 committee; and 15 (iii) begins on or before July 1, 2024 2025. 16 (g) On or before December 1, 2023 2024, the Workgroup shall report its findings 17 and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 18 Government Article, the General Assembly. 19 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 20 1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year 2 years and 1 month and, at the end 21 of June 30, 2024 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 22 shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 23 Approved: ________________________________________________________________________________ Governor. ________________________________________________________________________________ Speaker of the House of Delegates. ________________________________________________________________________________ President of the Senate.