Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB1155 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/03/2023

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb1155*  
  
HOUSE BILL 1155 
J1   	3lr2409 
      
By: Delegate Bridges Delegates Bridges, Pena–Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, 
Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, 
Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Rosenberg, Taveras, White, 
and Woods 
Introduced and read first time: February 10, 2023 
Assigned to: Health and Government Operations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 21, 2023 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned Integrated Behavioral Health 2 
Model 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned 4 
Integrated Behavior Health Model to study youth codesigned behavioral health 5 
models and develop a plan and make recommendations regarding the 6 
implementation of a youth codesigned behavioral health care pilot in the State; and 7 
generally relating to the Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned Integrated 8 
Behavioral Health Model. 9 
 
Preamble 10 
 
 WHEREAS, Experience based codesign is an evidence–based process that involves 11 
people in the decisions that will have an impact on them, and where decision–making power 12 
is shared between professionals and people who use services; and 13 
 
 WHEREAS, The youth codesign model is a model in which youth are not only the 14 
recipients of services, but are partners in all elements of that service, including 15 
implementation, evaluation, and the evolution of services; and 16 
 
 WHEREAS, Integrated youth behavioral health care is an enhanced primary care 17 
model, typically with a single, visible, trusted location, including providers organized as a 18  2 	HOUSE BILL 1155  
 
 
dedicated team of clinical and nonclinical personnel, such as a peer worker, providing the 1 
full spectrum of care for a youth and their family; now, therefore, 2 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 3 
That: 4 
 
 (a) There is a Workgroup on Establishing a Youth Codesigned Integrated 5 
Behavioral Health Model. 6 
 
 (b) The Workgroup consists of the following members: 7 
 
 (1) the Secretary of the Department of Juvenile Services, or the Secretary’s 8 
designee; 9 
 
 (2) the Deputy Secretary for Behavioral Health, or the Deputy Secretary’s 10 
designee; 11 
 
 (3) the Executive Director of the Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, 12 
Youth, and Victim Services, or the Executive Director’s designee; 13 
 
 (4) five individuals who are at least 16 years old and under the age of 25 14 
years who have experienced behavioral health conditions and, to the extent practicable, are 15 
from diverse geographic areas of the State, appointed by the Secretary of Health; and 16 
 
 (5) the following members to be selected through application to the 17 
Behavioral Health Administration: 18 
 
 (i) two representatives of behavioral health advocacy organizations 19 
representing consumers and families; 20 
 
 (ii) one representative of a community behavioral health provider 21 
serving children and youth; 22 
 
 (iii) one representative of a peer–led behavioral health organization; 23 
and 24 
 
 (iv) one representative of an organization serving children and youth 25 
involved in the juvenile justice system. 26 
 
 (c) The Deputy Secretary for Behavioral Health, or the Deputy Secretary’s 27 
designee, shall serve as the chair of the Workgroup. 28 
 
 (d) The Behavioral Health Administration shall provide staff for the Workgroup. 29 
 
 (e) A member of the Workgroup is entitled to reimbursement for expenses under 30 
the Standard State Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget. 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 1155 	3 
 
 
 (f) The Workgroup shall: 1 
 
 (1) review youth codesigned integrated behavioral health models across 2 
the country and internationally; 3 
 
 (2) identify successful youth codesigned integrated behavioral health 4 
models, and the tools, strategies, and funding sources needed to implement similar 5 
strategies in the State; 6 
 
 (3) develop a plan for establishing a sustainable youth advisory committee 7 
to play an ongoing role in the development and implementation of the pilot program 8 
described in item (4) of this subsection; and 9 
 
 (4) develop a plan for implementing a youth codesigned integrated 10 
behavioral health care pilot program in the State that: 11 
 
 (i) includes a program plan for three sites in different geographic 12 
areas in the State; 13 
 
 (ii) uses the codesign model in collaboration with the youth advisory 14 
committee; and 15 
 
 (iii) begins on or before July 1, 2024 2025. 16 
 
 (g) On or before December 1, 2023 2024, the Workgroup shall report its findings 17 
and recommendations to the Governor and, in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State 18 
Government Article, the General Assembly. 19 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 20 
1, 2023. It shall remain effective for a period of 1 year 2 years and 1 month and, at the end 21 
of June 30, 2024 2025, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 22 
shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect.  23 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate.