Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {493926/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |