Senate | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-2) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |