House
|
05/16/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (134-6)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {623029/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {713420/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
|
|
|