Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (105-33) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {893621/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |