LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Maryland MD
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB129
Action History
MD
Maryland House Bill HB129
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Maryland 2023 Regular Session
Maryland House Bill HB129
Action History
Senate
03/03/2023
Referred Judicial Proceedings
House
03/02/2023
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
House
02/28/2023
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
House
02/27/2023
Favorable Report by Judiciary
House
01/17/2023
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
House
01/13/2023
First Reading Judiciary