House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-5) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (101-37) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |